Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Salazar y Espinoza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua

Titular Bishop of Turres in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1915BornManagua
13 Jan 194125.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 196953.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of León en Nicaragua
14 Apr 196953.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Città Ducale
29 Jun 196953.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Città Ducale
30 Jan 197357.3AppointedBishop of León en Nicaragua
19 Dec 198166.2ResignedBishop of León en Nicaragua
19 Dec 198166.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres in Byzacena
16 Aug 199579.9DiedBishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Manuel Salazar y Espinoza:
Bishop Manuel Salazar y Espinoza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013