Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Felipe Antonio (Juan José) Pérez del Notario

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1757BornAguilar del Río Alhama, Spain
26 Aug 180345.8SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
28 May 180446.5ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
15 May 180648.5DiedBishop-Elect of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Felipe Antonio (Juan José) Pérez del Notario:
Father Felipe Antonio (Juan José) Pérez del Notario (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Nicaragua

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 282
  • ab/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 125, Number 665

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015