Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Zayas, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nicaragua


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1575AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
8 Mar 1582ResignedBishop of Nicaragua
16 Oct 1582DiedBishop Emeritus of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Zayas
Bishop Antonio de Zayas O.F.M. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEcija, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 86, Number 526
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 4*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast