Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Bernardo Piñol y Aycinena

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1806¹BornGuatemala
15 Aug 183024.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 185448.9AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
17 Jul 185953.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
20 Sep 186761.7AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
19 May 188175.4DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Bernardo Piñol y Aycinena:
Archbishop José Bernardo Piñol y Aycinena (died ) Archbishop of Guatemala

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 295, and Page 412
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013