Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simeón Pereira y Castellón

Deceased

Bishop of León en Nicaragua

Titular Archbishop of Cyzicus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1863³Born
2 Dec 189532.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nicaragua
2 Dec 189532.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
25 Jul 189633.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
30 Jul 190239.1SucceededBishop of Nicaragua
15 Jan 191450.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyzicus
2 Feb 192157.6DiedBishop of León en Nicaragua

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simeón Pereira y Castellón
Archbishop Simeón Pereira y Castellón (born , died ) Bishop of León en Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeón, Diocese of Nicaragua
Ordained BishopCathedral, León, Diocese of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 245, and Page 412
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017