Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Ulloa y Calvo

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1821BornLeón
3 May 184423.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nicaragua
5 May 184423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Nicaragua
25 Sep 186544.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nicaragua
25 Sep 186544.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
14 Jan 186645.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limyra
20 Sep 186746.7SucceededBishop of Nicaragua
25 Jan 187958.0DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Manuel Ulloa y Calvo:
Bishop Manuel Ulloa y Calvo (born , died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 343, and Page 412

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013