Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esteban Lorenzo de Tristán y Esmenota

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1723BornJaén, Spain
11 Sep 177552.1AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
14 Jan 177652.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
23 Mar 177753.6InstalledBishop of Nicaragua
15 Dec 178360.3AppointedBishop of Durango, México
19 Apr 179369.7AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
2 Jul 179369.9InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
10 Dec 179471.3DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Esteban Lorenzo de Tristán y Esmenota:
Bishop Esteban Lorenzo de Tristán y Esmenota (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 92, Number 474

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013