Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octavio José Calderón y Padilla

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Matagalpa

Titular Bishop of Cluentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1904BornSomoto Grande
20 Feb 192722.5Ordained PriestPriest of León en Nicaragua
13 Jun 194641.8AppointedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
26 Jan 194742.4Ordained BishopBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
22 Jun 197065.8ResignedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
22 Jun 197065.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cluentum
2 Mar 197267.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Matagalpa, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Octavio José Calderón y Padilla:
Bishop Octavio José Calderón y Padilla (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Matagalpa

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013