Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pompeo Cardinal Colonna

Deceased

Administrator of Monreale

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Administrator of Sarno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1479BornRome
6 Oct 150829.4AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
20 Mar 151434.9ResignedBishop of Rieti, Italy
1 Jul 151738.1Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 151738.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
14 May 152041.0AppointedAdministrator of Terni, Italy
5 Dec 152041.6ResignedAdministrator of Terni, Italy
7 Jan 152141.7AppointedAdministrator of Potenza, Italy
27 Feb 152343.8AppointedAdministrator of Catania, Italy
11 Jan 152444.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
18 Jan 152444.7AppointedAdministrator of Acerno, Italy
23 Jun 152546.1ResignedAdministrator of Acerno, Italy
3 Jul 152546.1AppointedAdministrator of L’Aquila, Italy
21 Nov 152647.5ResignedAdministrator of Potenza, Italy
1528²48.6AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
20 Apr 152949.9AppointedAdministrator of Aversa, Italy
27 Aug 152950.3ResignedBishop of Rieti, Italy
24 Sep 152950.4ResignedAdministrator of Aversa, Italy
24 Aug 153051.3AppointedAdministrator of Sarno, Italy
14 Dec 153051.6AppointedAdministrator of Monreale, Italy
153252.6ResignedAdministrator of L’Aquila, Italy
28 Jun 153253.1DiedAdministrator of Monreale, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Colonna:
Cardinal Pompeo Colonna (born , died ) Administrator of Monreale

  • a cardinal for 15.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 113, and Page 213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 93, and Page 283
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 293, and Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013