Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Angelo Maria Aloisio

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Marsi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1835Born
9 Apr 185923.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 189559.5AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Aloisio
Father Angelo Maria Aloisio (born ) Bishop-Elect of Marsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pio delle Camere, Archdiocese of L’Aquila

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017