Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Sabatini d’Anfora, C.P.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of L’Aquila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1708BornNapoli
10 Mar 173122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Pious Workers
1 Jan 175041.8SelectedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
23 Feb 175041.9ConfirmedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
1 Mar 175041.9Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
6 Jul 177668.3DiedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Sabatini d’Anfora:
Bishop Ludovico Sabatini d’Anfora C.P.O. (born , died ) Bishop of L’Aquila

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013