Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adolfo Turchi

Deceased

Archbishop of L’Aquila, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1863Born
30 Jun 190945.6AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
5 Sep 190945.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
8 Sep 191450.8ResignedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
8 Sep 191450.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
8 Sep 191450.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Canopus
17 Jul 191854.7AppointedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
2 May 192965.5DiedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Turchi
Archbishop Adolfo Turchi (born , died ) Archbishop of L’Aquila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalignano

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 110, and Page 62
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1909, Number 53
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast