Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Coppola, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1698BornNapoli
20 Sep 172123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
17 Apr 174243.7SelectedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
25 May 174243.8ConfirmedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
27 May 174243.8Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
23 Oct 174951.2SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
1 Dec 174951.3ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
8 Aug 176769.0DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Coppola:
Bishop Giuseppe Coppola C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 93, and Page 154
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013