Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Garigliano

Deceased

Bishop of Biella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1872BornPoirino
1895¹22.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 191139.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
24 Sep 191139.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
22 Mar 191744.6AppointedBishop of Biella, Italy
10 Oct 193664.1DiedBishop of Biella, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Garigliano:
Bishop Giovanni Garigliano (born , died ) Bishop of Biella

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 168, and Page 95
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013