Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe de Rossi

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1596AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
29 Mar 1599AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
12 Sep 1605AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
5 Feb 1610³DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe de Rossi
Archbishop Giuseppe de Rossi (died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 90, and Page 67
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 262
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast