Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Battista Cannella

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1799²Born
3 Mar 1853³54.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
17 Jan 185960.0ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
27 Mar 185960.2DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Cannella
Father Giovanni Battista Cannella (born 1799, died ) Secretary Emeritus of Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceL'Aquila, Archdiocese of L’Aquila, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b/x933: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast