Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolano Manieri

Deceased

Bishop of L’Aquila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1757BornCitta di Aquila
22 Sep 178124.0Ordained PriestPriest of L’Aquila, Italy
20 Mar 181860.5SelectedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
6 Apr 181860.6ConfirmedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
19 Apr 181860.6Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
12 Nov 184487.2DiedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolano Manieri
Bishop Girolano Manieri (born , died ) Bishop of L’Aquila

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 84
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 May 2016