Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Livio Reginaldo Fischione, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Riohacha, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Aquae in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1925Born
19 Feb 195024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Sep 196641.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Riohacha, Colombia
29 Sep 196641.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Byzacena
12 Dec 196641.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Byzacena
16 Jul 198863.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Riohacha, Colombia
10 Jun 200984.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Riohacha, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Livio Reginaldo Fischione
Bishop Livio Reginaldo Fischione O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Riohacha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTornimparte, Italy

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast