Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basile Pignatelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of L’Aquila


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1593AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
5 Sep 1593Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
1599²ResignedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
30 Jul 1629DiedBishop Emeritus of L’Aquila, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basile Pignatelli:
Bishop Basile Pignatelli C.R. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of L’Aquila

  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 90
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 113
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 32, Number 158
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013