Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Tello de León, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of L’Aquila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹BornGranada, Spain
1 Jun 165460.4AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
14 Jun 165460.5Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
16 Feb 1662³68.1DiedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Tello de León:
Bishop Francesco Tello de León O.SS.T. (died ) Bishop of L’Aquila

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 117, Number 713
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 90
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 184, Number 1,146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013