Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Martini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of L’Aquila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1913BornFontana Fredda
4 Oct 193623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
25 Mar 195844.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
5 Oct 196148.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Abari
29 Oct 196148.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Abari
29 Nov 196350.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Philippines
5 Aug 196753.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
6 Jul 197056.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
2 Jun 197359.6AppointedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
31 Dec 198370.2ResignedArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
16 Jul 198672.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Martini:
Archbishop Carlo Martini (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of L’Aquila

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015