Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Gualtieri

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1740³BornLeculo
14 Apr 176524.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 179251.5SelectedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
26 Mar 179251.7ConfirmedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
9 Apr 179251.7Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
20 Mar 181877.7SelectedBishop of Caserta, Italy
6 Apr 181877.7ConfirmedBishop of Caserta, Italy
15 Jun 183190.9DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Gualtieri:
Bishop Francesco Saverio Gualtieri (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 93
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013