Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Taglialatela

Deceased

Bishop of L’Aquila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1666BornPanicocoli
26 Mar 168922.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 169024.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 171851.5AppointedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
12 Jun 171851.6Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
18 Mar 174275.3DiedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Taglialatela:
Bishop Domenico Taglialatela (born , died ) Bishop of L’Aquila

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 93
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 49
  • bp: CB, 3 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015