Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo de Angelis

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹Born
26 Jan 166343.0SelectedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
13 Aug 166343.6ConfirmedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
26 Aug 166343.6Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
8 Jul 167454.5SelectedBishop of Acerra, Italy
17 Dec 167454.9ConfirmedBishop of Acerra, Italy
Sep 1690³70.6DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo de Angelis (VIAF: 232632971)
Bishop Carlo de Angelis (born 1620, died Sep 1690) Bishop of Acerra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo in Lucina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 67
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 90
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 6
  • c4: AT, 28 Aug 2016
  • b/c24: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,031

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast