Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François du Mouchet de Villedieu

Deceased

Bishop of Digne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1731BornVilledieu
23 Feb 178452.2SelectedBishop of Digne, France
25 Jun 178452.5ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
18 Jul 178452.6Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
10 Aug 182391.7DiedBishop of Digne, France

MicroData Summary for François du Mouchet de Villedieu:
Bishop François du Mouchet de Villedieu (born , died ) Bishop of Digne

  • a bishop for 39.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016