Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Paul du Queylar (Caylar)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Digne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1716Born
13 Mar 175841.7AppointedBishop of Digne, France
16 Apr 175841.7Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
20 Jun 178467.9ResignedBishop of Digne, France
15 Dec 178468.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Digne, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Paul du Queylar (Caylar)
Bishop Pierre-Paul du Queylar (Caylar) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Digne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarages

  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,758, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast