Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Abel Mortier

Deceased

Bishop of Digne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1825Born
23 Dec 184823.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 188761.7SelectedBishop of Digne, France
26 May 188761.8ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
24 Jul 188761.9Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
27 Jan 188963.4DiedBishop of Digne, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Abel Mortier
Bishop Henri-Abel Mortier (born , died ) Bishop of Digne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBavay
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cambrai, Archdiocese of Cambrai

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast