Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Melchior-Charles-Bienvenu de Miollis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Digne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1753Born
20 Sep 177724.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 180552.1SelectedBishop of Digne, France
23 Dec 180552.5ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
13 Apr 180652.8Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
1 Jun 180652.9InstalledBishop of Digne, France
31 Aug 183885.1RetiredBishop of Digne, France
27 Jun 184390.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Digne, France

MicroData Summary for François-Melchior-Charles-Bienvenu de Miollis
Bishop François-Melchior-Charles-Bienvenu de Miollis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Digne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix-en-Provence

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast