Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Vintimille du Luc

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornLuc
13 Sep 166954.6SelectedBishop of Digne, France
2 Jun 167055.4ConfirmedBishop of Digne, France
21 Sep 167055.7Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
17 Sep 167560.7SelectedBishop of Toulon, France
27 Apr 167661.3ConfirmedBishop of Toulon, France
15 Nov 168267.8DiedBishop of Toulon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Vintimille du Luc:
Bishop Jean de Vintimille du Luc (died ) Bishop of Toulon

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 184, and Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 10 Apr 2015