Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gregorio Castro Miranda, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuzco

Titular Bishop of Clazomenae

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1859BornCuzco
16 Feb 189636.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
23 Sep 190040.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Mar 191050.3AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
10 Jul 191050.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
13 Nov 191758.0ResignedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
13 Nov 191758.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
13 Nov 191758.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
30 Jan 192464.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Gregorio Castro Miranda:
Bishop José Gregorio Castro Miranda O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuzco

  • a priest for 23.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b: LB, 5 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013