Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe Santiago Hermosa y Sarmiento

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1893Born
23 Feb 191824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cuzco, Peru
13 Jun 193542.1AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
8 Sep 193542.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
23 May 194350.0AppointedArchbishop of Cuzco, Peru
17 Dec 195663.6ResignedArchbishop of Cuzco, Peru
17 Dec 195663.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Peru, Military
17 Dec 195663.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beroea
12 Aug 196774.2RetiredBishop of Peru, Military
20 Jan 197177.7ResignedTitular Archbishop of Beroea
30 Jun 198087.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Felipe Santiago Hermosa y Sarmiento
Archbishop Felipe Santiago Hermosa y Sarmiento (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuzco, Diocese of Cuzco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 68
  • c34: CB, 8 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,255
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,665

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast