Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Montoya Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo

Note/Previous Titular See: (appointment to Cuzco after death)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1593BornMijancas, Spain
5 Sep 163340.1AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
27 Dec 163441.4Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
20 Feb 163743.5SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
5 Oct 163744.2ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
14 Apr 164046.7DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
16 Jul 164046.9AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Diego Montoya Mendoza:
Bishop Diego Montoya Mendoza (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 170, and Page 347
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 285
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 161, Number 1,014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015