Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ciro Quispe López

Prelate of Juli, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1973 Born
30 Nov 200128.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cuzco, Peru
15 Nov 201845.0AppointedPrelate of Juli, Peru
15 Dec 201845.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Juli, Peru

MicroData Summary for Ciro Quispe López (VIAF: 283448410)
Father Ciro Quispe López (born ) Prelate of Juli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuzco, Archdiocese of Cuzco
Ordained BishopSan Pedro Apostol, Cathedral, Juli, Territorial Prelature of Juli

Please contact the Father through the Territorial Prelature of Juli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2018
  • ob: CB, 20 Nov 2018
  • c2+: CB, 21 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Nov 2018

Quantcast