Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomé María de las Heras Navarro

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1743Born
14 Dec 178946.6AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
10 Oct 179047.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
31 Mar 180662.9AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
18 Nov 180663.5InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
6 Sep 182380.3DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé María de las Heras Navarro (VIAF: 36875637)
Archbishop Bartolomé María de las Heras Navarro (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarmona, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Arequipa, Diocese of Arequipa
Death PlaceMadrid

  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 190
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 238
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 108, Number 564
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 20 Dec 2020

Quantcast