Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo de Serreda y Villate, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1672BornMadrid, Spain
2 Jul 168816.3ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
3 Mar 172149.0AppointedBishop of Panamá
14 Dec 172149.8Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
19 Dec 172553.8AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
2 Mar 173361.0DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Serreda y Villate:
Bishop Bernardo de Serreda y Villate O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 179, and Page 305
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 44
  • prof: CB, 15 Nov 2015
  • bd/prof/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 5 Jan 2016