Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado

Vicariatus Apostolicus Portus Maldonadi



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 10 March 1949
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 150,000 (57,937 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 38, Mision San Jacinto, Puerto Maldonado, Peru
  • Telephone: (084)57.10.10; 57.26.18
  • Fax: 57.35.42

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of San Domingo de Urubamba
5 January 1900ErectedDiocese of Cuzco Prefecture Apostolic of San Domingo de Urubamba (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios
4 July 1913ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of San Domingo de Urubamba Vicariate Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios
Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado
10 March 1949Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Urubamba y Madre de Dios Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado
194930,00042,00071.4%22221,36327337ap1951
196632,50035,00092.9%404081253404ap1967
1970100,000150,00066.7%33333,0305053ap1971
1976142,000150,00094.7%33334,30345617ap1977
1980150,000165,00090.9%127285,35735507ap1981
1990218,000225,00096.9%127287,785335012ap1991
1999222,000238,00093.3%335385,8425455017ap2000
2000223,000238,00093.7%334376,0275465018ap2001
2001224,000245,00091.4%332356,400425017ap2002
2002220,000250,00088.0%633395,641374817ap2003
2003218,000252,00086.5%1719366,055305218ap2004
2004217,000258,00084.1%1921405,425354318ap2005
2010237,000296,00080.1%2420445,386353522ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014