Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Castañeda Velásquez y Salazar

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1683BornLima, Peru
7 May 174258.5SelectedBishop of Panamá
9 Jul 174258.7ConfirmedBishop of Panamá
14 Dec 174360.1Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
6 Dec 174865.1SelectedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
20 Jan 174965.2ConfirmedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
22 Feb 176278.3DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan de Castañeda Velásquez y Salazar:
Bishop Juan de Castañeda Velásquez y Salazar (born , died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,473
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 190, and Page 326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013