Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Mollinedo Angulo

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626²BornMadrid
15 Dec 167044.9AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
22 Jan 167347.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
26 Sep 169973.7DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Mollinedo Angulo:
Bishop Manuel de Mollinedo Angulo (born 1626, died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 26.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 179
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 207, Number 1,294
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 74
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015