Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Gorritátegui (Gorrichategui)

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1716Born
12 Dec 177054.1AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
6 Oct 177154.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
28 Oct 177660.0DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Agustín Gorritátegui (Gorrichategui)
Bishop Agustín Gorritátegui (Gorrichategui) (born , died ) Bishop of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanama

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,889
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast