Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Morcillo Rubio de Suñón

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1684²BornVillarrobledo, Spain
14 Feb 172440.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
14 Feb 172440.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Draso
8 Oct 172440.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Draso
17 Sep 173147.7AppointedBishop of Panamá
20 Feb 174258.1SelectedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
18 Apr 174258.3ConfirmedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
1 Apr 174763.3DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Morcillo Rubio de Suñón:
Bishop Pedro Morcillo Rubio de Suñón (died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 188
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 326, and Page 190
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 42, Number 157

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013