Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Francis Leibold

Deceased

Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1914Born
18 May 194025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
10 Apr 195843.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
10 Apr 195843.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Trebenna
17 Jun 195843.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trebenna
4 Apr 196651.2AppointedBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
15 Jun 196651.4InstalledBishop of Evansville, Indiana, USA
23 Jul 196954.5AppointedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
2 Oct 196954.7InstalledArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
1 Jun 197257.4DiedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Francis Leibold
Archbishop Paul Francis Leibold (born , died ) Archbishop of Cincinnati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDayton

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast