Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George John Rehring

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Toledo, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1890BornCincinnati
28 Mar 191423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
6 Aug 193747.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
6 Aug 193747.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lunda
7 Oct 193747.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lunda
18 Jul 195060.1AppointedBishop of Toledo, Ohio, USA
25 Feb 196776.7RetiredBishop of Toledo, Ohio, USA
25 Feb 196776.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
31 Dec 197080.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
29 Feb 197685.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Toledo, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for George John Rehring:
Bishop George John Rehring (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Toledo

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1937, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013