Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carl Kevin Moeddel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cincinnati, Ohio

Titular Bishop of Bistue


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1937BornElmwood Place
15 Aug 196224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
15 Jun 199355.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
15 Jun 199355.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bistue
24 Aug 199355.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bistue
20 Jun 200769.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
25 Aug 200971.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Carl Kevin Moeddel:
Bishop Carl Kevin Moeddel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cincinnati

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,128
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013