Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Anthony King Mussio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Steubenville, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1902Born
15 Aug 193533.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
10 Mar 194542.7AppointedBishop of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
1 May 194542.8Ordained BishopBishop of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
27 Sep 197775.2RetiredBishop of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
15 Apr 197875.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Steubenville, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for John Anthony King Mussio
Bishop John Anthony King Mussio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Steubenville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCincinnati

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast