Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clarence George Issenmann

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1907Born
29 Jun 193225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
24 Mar 195446.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
24 Mar 195446.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Phytea
25 May 195446.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phytea
5 Dec 195750.5AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
7 Oct 196457.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
7 Oct 196457.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Filaca
2 Feb 196557.6InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
22 Sep 196659.3SucceededBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
5 Jun 197467.0ResignedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
27 Jul 198275.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Clarence George Issenmann
Bishop Clarence George Issenmann (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHamilton, OH

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast