Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Joseph Beckman

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

Titular Archbishop of Phulli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1875Born
20 Jun 190226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
23 Dec 192348.1AppointedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
1 May 192448.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
1 Jun 192650.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
4 Jul 192852.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
17 Jan 193054.2AppointedArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
9 Nov 194671.0ResignedArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
9 Nov 194671.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Phulli
17 Oct 194872.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Beckman
Archbishop Francis Joseph Beckman (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dubuque

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCincinnati

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • aadm/o003: CB, 20 Sep 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast