Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Henry Garland

Bishop Emeritus of Marquette, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1931 Born
15 Aug 195927.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
2 Jun 198452.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
2 Jun 198452.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Garriana
25 Jul 198452.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garriana
6 Oct 199260.8AppointedBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
11 Nov 199260.9InstalledBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
13 Dec 200574.0ResignedBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for James Henry Garland
Bishop James Henry Garland (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Marquette

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilmington

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Marquette.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast