Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Hubert Le Blond

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

Titular Bishop of Orcistus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1883Born
29 Jun 190925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
21 Jul 193349.6AppointedBishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
21 Sep 193349.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
24 Aug 195672.7ResignedBishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
24 Aug 195672.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Orcistus
30 Dec 195875.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Hubert Le Blond
Bishop Charles Hubert Le Blond (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Joseph

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCelina, OH

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,933, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast