Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Romano

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1669BornSimbario
9 Jun 169122.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Feb 169324.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 173061.6AppointedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
29 Sep 173061.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
26 Sep 173566.7AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
6 Jan 173666.9DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Romano:
Bishop Giovanni Romano (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013