Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Paola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Catanzaro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 May 1518AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
24 May 1518Ordained BishopBishop of Nicastro, Italy
24 Jul 1523AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
1529¹ResignedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Paola
Bishop Antonio de Paola , Bishop Emeritus of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 158, and Page 256
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1518, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast